Schaffer, Stephen Allan (CPSO#: 90347)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 18 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Apr 2009 to 06 May 2009
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 8 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013