Schantz, Daryl Ivan (CPSO#: 95593)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 31 Dec 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 05 Mar 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2012