Schecter, Danial Marvin Isak (CPSO#: 89519)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cannabinoid Medical Clinic
Suite 407
1 Eglinton East
Toronto ON  M4P 3A1
Phone: (647) 406-4902
Fax: (416) 482-3535
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

201 Georgian Drive
Barrie
Ontario
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Canada
Phone: (705) 728-9090
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Cadence Health Centre
200 Spadina Ave
Toronto ON  M5T 2C2
Canada
Phone: 416-203-8600
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Schecter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Schecter ( CPSO# 89519 )

Business Address:
Cannabinoid Medical Clinic
Suite 407
1 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 3A1
Phone Number: (888) 282-7763

Business Address:
200 Spadina Avenue
Toronto ON  M5T 2C2
Phone Number: (416) 203-8600

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9802

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIAL MARVIN ISAK SCHECTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHECTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010