Schindler, David Leon (CPSO#: 94671)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 26 Dec 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cornwall Community Hospital
Division of Emergency Medicine
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone: (613) 938-4240
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Dec 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jun 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 28 Nov 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  David  Leon  Schindler  may  practise independently in Emergency Medicine,
            only.