Schlebusch, Gert Hendrik Gabriel (CPSO#: 83731)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Mar 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Mar 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, Dutch, English, Flemish, German

Education:University of the Orange Free State, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The London Road Diagnostic Clinic
and Medical Centre
481 London Road
Sarnia ON  N7T 4X3
Phone: (519) 344-1121
Fax: (519) 344-0115
Electoral District: 01

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan
South Africa
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GERT HENDRIK GABRIEL SCHLEBUSCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHLEBUSCH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2005
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Oct 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Mar 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2006