Schliewinsky, Kharim Jean-Alexandre (CPSO#: 97796)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Sep 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Forces Health Svcs Centre
Ottawa
101 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K2
Phone: 613-945-1367
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Sep 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KHARIM JEAN-ALEXANDRE SCHLIEWINSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHLIEWINSKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2013 to 18 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 19 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2014