Schlossmacher, Michael Gebhard (CPSO#: 85700)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Dec 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 23 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Vienna, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Medicine
Division of Neurology
1053 Carling Avenue - C2
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 5625462 Ext. 0
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Austria
USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 18 Dec 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL GEBHARD SCHLOSSMACHER may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DEPARTMENT OF MEDICINE, UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA in which Dr. SCHLOSSMACHER holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. SCHLOSSMACHER may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. SCHLOSSMACHER no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. SCHLOSSMACHER no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. SCHLOSSMACHER no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2011