Schmidt, Heidi Christa (CPSO#: 77345)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 Oct 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Roberts, Heidi Christa (used until: 15 Dec 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Johannes Gutenberg University at Mainz, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
1-PMB 286
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 323-3422
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017


Corporation Name: Dr. Heidi Schmidt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Schmidt ( CPSO# 77345 )

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Room 2231
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6186

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2000

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hosital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800


Corporation Name: H. Schmidt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mohan ( CPSO# 85166 )
Dr. T. Chung ( CPSO# 74873 )
Dr. R. Farb ( CPSO# 55462 )
Dr. A. Hanbidge ( CPSO# 63102 )
Dr. M. Lax ( CPSO# 68111 )
Dr. D. Mandell ( CPSO# 79347 )
Dr. H. Schmidt ( CPSO# 77345 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
562 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X6
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
University Health Network
1 - PMP 284
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Suite 256, 3rd Floor
256 - 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
Suite 918
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2000

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 04 Mar 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2002
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Jan 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Oct 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 18 Oct 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Heidi Christa Roberts may practise medicine independently in diagnostic
            radiology, only.