Schmidt, Marcello Frederico Santos (CPSO#: 90425)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Universidade Estadual de Campinas, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 822-5350
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Canada
Phone: (519) 621-2330
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marcello Schmidt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 17 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Schmidt ( CPSO# 90425 )

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7S6
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Business Address:
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARCELLO FREDERICO SANTOS SCHMIDT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHMIDT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2009 to 23 Jun 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Jun 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 May 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 2016