Schmidt, Rebecca Prasad (CPSO#: 92881)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University MUSC B101
1280 Main Street West L8S 4S4
Hamilton ON  L8S 4S4
Phone: (905) 525-9140 Ext. 27700
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sadhana Prasad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Schmidt ( CPSO# 92881 )
Dr. S. Prasad ( CPSO# 51402 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital Corporation
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
Listowel Memorial Hospital
255 Elizabeth Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2P5
Phone Number: (519) 291-3290

Business Address:
St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 749-6929

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA PRASAD SCHMIDT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHMIDT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2012