Schmitz, Carmen Joy (CPSO#: 84508)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 3
2 Main Street South
Bayfield ON  N0M 1G0
Phone: (519) 565-4141
Fax: (519) 565-4332
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Curtis Schmitz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Curtis ( CPSO# 82657 )
Dr. C. Schmitz ( CPSO# 84508 )

Business Address:
24 Centennial Drive
Seaforth ON  N0K 1W0
Phone Number: (519) 527-1650

Business Address:
685 Adelaide Street North
London ON  N5Y 2L4
Phone Number: (519) 601-7171

Business Address:
525 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E2
Phone Number: (519) 621-9257

Business Address:
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 272-8210

Business Address:
Unit 3
2 Main Street South
Bayfield ON  N0M 1G0
Phone Number: (519) 565-4141

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARMEN JOY SCHMITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHMITZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2008