Schneider, Evan (CPSO#: 106032)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Temmy Latner Centre
60 Murray Street, 4th Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: 416-586-4800 Ext. 7884
Fax: 416-586-4804
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

137 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto ON  M6R 2L2
Canada
Phone: (416) 901-0717
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EVAN SCHNEIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHNEIDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2017