Schofield, Lee Mark (CPSO#: 86805)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
St. Lawrence Health Centre
140 The Esplanade, 1st Floor Unit 3
Toronto ON  M5A4P5
Phone: (416) 864-6000
Fax: 416-360-4902
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

U of Toronto MacIntosh Clinic
100 Devonshire Place
Toronto
Ontario
Toronto ON  M5S 2C9
Canada
Phone: 416-978-4678
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Pivot Sport Medicine & Orthopedics
2288 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 1N9
Canada
Phone: (416) 767-4868
Fax: (416) 763-2577
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEE MARK SCHOFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHOFIELD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2009