Scholes, Michelle Lynn (CPSO#: 79093)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 26 Aug 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 206
1206 Centre Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 3M9
Phone: (905) 907-9998
Fax: (905) 907-9098
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michelle Scholes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Scholes ( CPSO# 79093 )

Business Address:
Unit 206
1206 Centre Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 3M9
Phone Number: (905) 907-9998

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jul 2011 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Mar 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 14 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jan 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Feb 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Apr 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Apr 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Michelle Lynn Scholes may practise medicine independently limited to child,
            adolescent and young adult Attention Deficit Hyperactivity Disorder, only.