Schramm, Belinda Minett (CPSO#: 75527)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Tasmania, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 20 Jul 2001
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jul 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013