Schreiber, Yoko Saschin (CPSO#: 82564)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:Dalhousie University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sioux Lookout Meno Ya Win Hospital
Day Medicine
PO Box 909
1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B4
Phone: 807 737 3030
Fax: 807 737 5257
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus, CPC 214
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: 613 798 5555 Ext. 10297
Fax: 613 761 4456
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YOKO SASCHIN SCHREIBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHREIBER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 8 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2010