Schuenemann, Holger Jens (CPSO#: 91933)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 29 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German, Italian

Education:Hanover Medical School, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
HSC Room 2C16
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 525-9140 Ext. 24931
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Schuenemann Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Schuenemann ( CPSO# 91933 )

Business Address:
McMaster University
Department of Clinical Epidemiology and Biostatist
and Biostatistics
1280 Main Street West Room 2C16
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Apr 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOLGER JENS SCHUENEMANN may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH RESEARCH METHODS, EVIDENCE AND IMPACT, AND DEPARTMENT OF MEDICINE, DIVISION OF GENERAL INTERNAL MEDICINE, MCMASTER UNIVERSITY in which Dr. SCHUENEMANN holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. SCHUENEMANN may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. SCHUENEMANN no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. SCHUENEMANN no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. SCHUENEMANN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 11 Jan 2012