Schuler, Jane Elizabeth (CPSO#: 88756)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: Murrin-Schuler, Jane Elizabeth (used until: 08 Dec 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 4315
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jane Schuler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Schuler ( CPSO# 88756 )

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANE ELIZABETH SCHULER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHULER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 09 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2013