Schurter, Matthew James (CPSO#: 82718)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Feb 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
26 Church Street
Sunderland ON  L0C 1H0
Phone: (705) 357-2336
Fax: (844) 825-8567
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Canada
Phone: (905) 985-2895 Ext. 5412
Fax: 8448258567
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

95 Bailey Street West
Suite B03
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Canada
Phone: (905) 426-2028
Fax: (905) 426-2033
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

1290 Keith Ross Crt
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Canada
Phone: (905) 723-8551
Fax: (905) 723-6319
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ali Gauster Schurter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ross ( CPSO# 88724 )
Dr. A. Armstrong ( CPSO# 84261 )
Dr. M. Brown ( CPSO# 69023 )
Dr. S. Shepherd ( CPSO# 71354 )
Dr. F. Nasser-Sharif ( CPSO# 72700 )
Dr. C. Hadden ( CPSO# 100522)
Dr. J. Moran ( CPSO# 100903)
Dr. A. Bruno ( CPSO# 101160)
Dr. M. Schurter ( CPSO# 82718 )
Dr. T. Stryde ( CPSO# 73931 )
Dr. F. Ali ( CPSO# 76181 )
Dr. C. Westbrook ( CPSO# 89258 )
Dr. D. Wang ( CPSO# 90666 )
Dr. B. Tse ( CPSO# 91489 )
Dr. R. Allin ( CPSO# 20746 )
Dr. P. Puckrin ( CPSO# 27488 )
Dr. G. Mercer ( CPSO# 60472 )
Dr. M. Gilmour ( CPSO# 59725 )
Dr. A. Brown ( CPSO# 59455 )
Dr. S. Russell ( CPSO# 60638 )
Dr. J. Tuck ( CPSO# 64782 )
Dr. M. Stewart ( CPSO# 62187 )
Dr. A. Gauster ( CPSO# 100273)
Dr. R. Adams ( CPSO# 72364 )
Dr. H. Nguyen ( CPSO# 88893 )
Dr. R. Wray ( CPSO# 86630 )
Dr. A. Chiella ( CPSO# 74700 )
Dr. K. Ferguson ( CPSO# 76506 )
Dr. S. Cull ( CPSO# 82751 )
Dr. K. Best ( CPSO# 75245 )
Dr. A. Pawley ( CPSO# 87461 )
Dr. A. Dayal ( CPSO# 79055 )
Dr. S. Hyshka ( CPSO# 67972 )
Dr. N. Kazarian ( CPSO# 71482 )
Dr. E. Russell ( CPSO# 59302 )

Business Address:
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895


Corporation Name: Matthew J. Schurter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Schurter ( CPSO# 82718 )

Business Address:
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895

Business Address:
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 723-8551

Business Address:
26 Church Street
Sunderland ON  L0C 1H0
Phone Number: (705) 357-2336

Business Address:
95 Bailey Street West
Suite B03
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 426-2028

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW JAMES SCHURTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHURTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2008