Schwartz, Kevin Lester (CPSO#: 91995)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000
Fax: (416) 530-6472
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: 416-438-2911 Ext. 3415
Fax: 416-431-8249
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto General Hospital
Tropical Disease Unit
200 Elizabeth St
Norman Urquhart Building - 13th flr
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
Phone: 4163403675
Fax: 4163403260
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin Schwartz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 03 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Schwartz ( CPSO# 91995 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN LESTER SCHWARTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHWARTZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Aug 2009 to 30 Aug 2009
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 31 Aug 2009 to 18 Sep 2009
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011