Schwartz, Lisa Catherine (CPSO#: 94838)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:City Univ N Y Mount Sinai School of Med, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lisa Catherine Schwartz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 8 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom
USA - New York
USA - Pennsylvania

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 28 Feb 2012
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 31 Jul 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016