Schwartz, Sarah B (CPSO#: 90517)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Nov 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Paediatric Medicine
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: 4168136275
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH B SCHWARTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHWARTZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2010