Schwarz, Duncan Kenneth (CPSO#: 77896)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Freeport Hospital
3570 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2A 2W1
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 7353
Fax: (519) 894-8316
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Duncan Schwarz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 22 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Schwarz ( CPSO# 77896 )

Business Address:
3570 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2A 2W1
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DUNCAN KENNETH SCHWARZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHWARZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2005