Schwarz, Fabian (CPSO#: 105032)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Feb 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Feb 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German, Norwegian

Education:University of Queensland, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Romsey Medical Centre
99 Main Street
Romsey VIC 3434
Romsey 3434
Australia
Phone: 616171006
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

285 Freedom Private
Ottawa ON  V3G0E6
Canada
Phone: 6136171006
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia
British Columbia
Norway

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FABIAN SCHWARZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHWARZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2015