Schwock, Joerg (CPSO#: 90888)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Leipzig, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
11E - 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 5001
Fax: (416) 340-5517
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOERG SCHWOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHWOCK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014