Science, Michelle Elizabeth Ida (CPSO#: 82589)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: Bridge, Michelle Elizabeth Ida (used until: 19 Jul 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Infectious Diseases
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 201157
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE ELIZABETH IDA SCIENCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCIENCE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2009