Scott, Caroline Yvonne (CPSO#: 95763)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4040 Finch Ave East Suite 401
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone: 416-754-7312
Fax: 416-754-0116
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Caroline Y. Scott Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Scott ( CPSO# 95763 )

Business Address:
4040 Finch Avenue East
Suite 401
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone Number: (416) 754-7312

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLINE YVONNE SCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCOTT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015