Scott, Courtney Anne (CPSO#: 95661)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 May 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 May 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
10 Trench Street, Room A100
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: 9058831212 Ext. 7721
Fax: 9058832246
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COURTNEY ANNE SCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCOTT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2017