Scully, Hugh Edwards (CPSO#: 26458)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. Hugh E. Scully 318 - 2095 Lakeshore Blvd W Toronto ON M8V 4G4
Date Received: 01 Jun 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018