Sebajang, Herawaty (CPSO#: 79774)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Romanian

Education:University of Montreal, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CHUM
1000 rue Saint Denis
Montreal, Quebec
H2X 0C1
Montreal QC  H2X 0C1
Phone: (514) 890-8444
Fax: (514) 412-7779
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

450 St Antoine est
Montreal QC  H2Y 1A5
Canada
Phone: 514-903-2903
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 13 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HERAWATY SEBAJANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEBAJANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2003