Sebastian, Shruti Alice (CPSO#: 107903)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Sep 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2120B Highway 551
PO Box 150
Mindemoya ON  P0P 1S0
Phone: (705) 377-4088
Fax: (705) 368-3566
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

19 Hospital Dr
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Canada
Phone: (705) 658-4544
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shruti Sebastian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sebastian ( CPSO# 107903)

Business Address:
P.O. Box 150
2120B Highway 551
Mindemoya ON  P0P 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 377-4088

Business Address:
22 Peninsula Road
Marathon ON  P0T 2E0
Phone Number: (807) 229-3243

Business Address:
19 Hospital Drive
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Phone Number: (705) 658-4544

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Manitoulin Health Centre,Mindemoya Site Mindemoya
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Sep 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHRUTI ALICE SEBASTIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEBASTIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 22 Sep 2015 to 14 Dec 2015
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 15 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 19 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 20 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 25 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2017