Seddigh, Maghsood (CPSO#: 89149)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 05 Mar 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Mar 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Shiraz University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Iran

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
International Specialist Physician - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Mar 2018