Seevaratnam, Loretta (CPSO#: 84497)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
105 Shipley Street
Clinton ON  N0M 1L0
Phone: (519) 482-3000
Fax: (519) 482-7648
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Seevaratnam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 26 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Seevaratnam ( CPSO# 84497 )

Business Address:
98 Shipley Street
Clinton ON  N0M 1L0
Phone Number: (519) 482-3447

Business Address:
105 Shipley Street
Clinton ON  N0M 1L0
Phone Number: (416) 482-3000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORETTA SEEVARATNAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEEVARATNAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010