Segal, Dan (CPSO#: 95765)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
180 Vine Street South, Unit 104
St Catharines ON  L2R 7P3
Phone: 1-855-210-0757 Ext. 245
Fax: 905-662-3304
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dan Segal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Segal ( CPSO# 95765 )

Business Address:
104 - 180 Vine Street South
St Catharines ON  L2R 7P3
Phone Number: (855) 210-0757

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 27 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAN SEGAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEGAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 07 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 06 Nov 2017
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015