Segal, Shaun Mark (CPSO#: 84600)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100/300
801 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1E3
Phone: (416) 789-2449
Fax: (416) 789-2253
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

7155 Woodbine Avenue suite 106
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Canada
Phone: 4167892449
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

901 King Street West
suite 105
Toronto ON  M5V 3H5
Canada
Phone: (416) 599-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

100/300 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1E3
Canada
Phone: (416) 789-2449
Fax: (416) 789-2253
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shaun Segal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Segal ( CPSO# 84600 )

Business Address:
Suite 100/300
801 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1E3
Phone Number: (416) 189-2449

Business Address:
Suite 105
901 King Street West
Toronto ON  M5V 3H5
Phone Number: (416) 599-6000

Business Address:
106 - 7155 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Phone Number: (416) 789-2449

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAUN MARK SEGAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEGAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008