Segall, Lorne Elliot (CPSO#: 73695)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
100 Queen Street South
Mississauga ON  L5M 1K8
Phone: (905) 607-0033
Fax: (905) 607-0036
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lorne Segall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Segall ( CPSO# 73695 )

Business Address:
102 - 100 Queen Street South
Mississauga ON  L5M 1K8
Phone Number: (905) 607-0033

Business Address:
1721 Lakeshore Road West
Mississauga ON  L5J 1J4

Business Address:
300 - 2797 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6B 4B9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORNE ELLIOT SEGALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEGALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2006