Seguin, Jean Jacques (CPSO#: 73691)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Activecare Caremedics F M C
Suite 103
311 McArthur Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1L 8M3
Phone: (613) 749-1678
Fax: (613) 749-9446
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1125 colonel by drive
Ottawa ON  K1S 5B6
Canada
Phone: (613) 520-3510
Fax: (613) 520-3974
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jean Seguin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 14 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Seguin ( CPSO# 73691 )

Business Address:
15 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa ON  K1J 5B6

Business Address:
Activecare Caremedics F M C
Suite 103
311 McArthur Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1L 8M3
Phone Number: (613) 749-1678

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEAN JACQUES SEGUIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEGUIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2001