Sehgal, Anupam Virendra (CPSO#: 96463)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:Nagpur University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-3232
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anupam Sehgal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sehgal ( CPSO# 96463 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-3232

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jul 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 14 Sep 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 15 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Anupam Virendra Sehgal may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Paediatrics, Queen's University, in which Dr. Sehgal holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Sehgal  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Sehgal's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Sehgal's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2016, and expires on June 30, 2019.
                  Upon renewal of Dr. Sehgal's academic appointment at Queen's University,
                  the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs
                  2 and 3 above.