Sehravat, Narinder Singh (CPSO#: 86968)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Maharshi Dayanand University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
1525 Albion Road
Etobicoke ON  M9V 5G5
Phone: (416) 740-2274
Fax: (416) 740-6178
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 205
5 Cherry Crest Drive
Brampton ON  L6P 3W4
Canada
Phone: 416-740-2274
Fax: 905-913-6169
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Narinder Singh Sehravat Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sehravat ( CPSO# 86968 )

Business Address:
Suite 305
1525 Albion Road
Toronto ON  M9V 5G5
Phone Number: (416) 740-2274

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NARINDER SINGH SEHRAVAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEHRAVAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 11 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2010