Seidl, Maja Maria (CPSO#: 73707)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 111
170 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 3A8
Phone: (905) 566-0121
Fax: (905) 566-8100
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dom Lipa Nursing Home
52 Neilson Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 1V7
Canada
Phone: (416) 621-3820
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAJA MARIA SEIDL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEIDL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2001