Seidl, Mladen (CPSO#: 23431)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 May 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 May 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English, Slovenian

Education:University of Zagreb, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Alderwood Medical Clinic 878 Browns Line Toronto, ON M8W 3W2 T: (416) 503-2541 F: (416) 503-2549
Instructions: As of May 1, 2018: Medical Records will be located at the above address.
Date Received: 08 Feb 2018


Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto, ON M6B 3Z4 Tel: (416) 781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338 Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083 Website: http://www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 03 Feb 2011

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 May 2018