Seidman, Sheryl Gail (CPSO#: 70217)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Emergency Room
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: 416-603-5405
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

28 Sandiford Drive
Stouffville ON  L4A 7X5
Canada
Phone: 905-640-7100
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

12050 Airport Road Unit 2
Caledon ON  L7C 2W1
Canada
Phone: 905-495-6649
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

955 Queen Street E Suite 70
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Canada
Phone: 1-888-270-2351
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sheryl Seidman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 25 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Seidman ( CPSO# 70217 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Emergency Department
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 603-5405

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Emergency Department
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5405

Business Address:
MyHealth Centre
2 - 12050 Airport Road
Caledon ON  L7C 2W1
Phone Number: (416) 603-5405

Business Address:
Oshawa Nuclear Medicine
300 King Street West
Suite 201
Oshawa ON  L1J 2K1
Phone Number: (416) 603-5405

Business Address:
Stouffville Nuclear & Cardiac Imaging
28 Saniford Drive
Stouffville ON  L4A 7X5
Phone Number: (416) 603-5405

Business Address:
My Doctor Now
24 - 279 Wharncliffe Road North
London ON  N6H 2C2
Phone Number: (416) 603-5405

Business Address:
My Doctor Now
70 - 955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone Number: (416) 603-5405


Corporation Name: Ira Cohen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Seidman ( CPSO# 70217 )
Dr. I. Cohen ( CPSO# 62606 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
5th Floor Morrow
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6591

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHERYL GAIL SEIDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEIDMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998