Seif-Zadeh, Atih (CPSO#: 83141)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Oct 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Oct 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:Spartan Health Sciences University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1762 Westwood blvd
Los angeles CA  90024
United States
Phone: 4246451918
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 7C
10288 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3B8
Canada
Phone: (424) 645-1918
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Seif Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 9 2015

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Maryland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 23 Apr 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ATIH SEIF-ZADEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEIF-ZADEH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2006