Seitelbach, Maayan (CPSO#: 88944)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 May 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oncology Clinic - Tower 1
The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: 416-431-8113
Fax: 416-431-8279
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Seitelbach and Gurfinkel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gurfinkel ( CPSO# 88805 )
Dr. M. Seitelbach ( CPSO# 88944 )

Business Address:
301 - 294 Main Street
Toronto ON  M4C 4X5
Phone Number: (416) 693-3030

Business Address:
Markham-Kingston Medical Centre
Suite 18
3545 Kingston Road
Toronto ON  M1M 1R6
Phone Number: (416) 266-6600

Business Address:
Oncology Clinic - Tower 1
The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 431-8113

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 24 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAAYAN SEITELBACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEITELBACH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 18 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 24 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 25 May 2011 to 24 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 25 May 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 25 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 26 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 2015