Sekhon, Suneet (CPSO#: 92918)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Apr 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
203-25 Charlton Ave East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone: (905) 523-7705
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Rai & Sekhon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sekhon ( CPSO# 92918 )
Dr. R. Rai ( CPSO# 92912 )

Business Address:
Suite 203
25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 523-7705

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 09 Feb 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUNEET SEKHON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEKHON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 09 Feb 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2015