Selaman, Mustafa Hashim (CPSO#: 74208)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Turkish

Education:University of Baghdad, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grace Hospital
300 Booth Drive
Winnipeg MB  R3J 3M7
Phone: (204) 837-0524

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUSTAFA HASHIM SELAMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SELAMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 04 Aug 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 27 Aug 2002
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2015