Selby, Rita (CPSO#: 66705)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Nov 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Nagpur University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
A 459
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5953
Fax: (416) 480-5153
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rita & Peter Selby Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Selby ( CPSO# 65523 )
Dr. R. Selby ( CPSO# 66705 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
A 459
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5105

Business Address:
CAMH
175 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1P7
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health,Whitby Site Whitby
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 12 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RITA SELBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SELBY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 1997