Selvanayagarajah, Selliah (CPSO#: 74293)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Colombo, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Selvanayagarajah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 14 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: York Medical Centre 10660 Yonge Street Richmond Hill ON L4C 3C9
Date Received: 05 Dec 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018