Selzner-Malekkiani, Nazia (CPSO#: 83701)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 08 Sep 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Paris, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
11Th Floor
PMB Room 178
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 3451
Fax: (416) 340-5321
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Michael's Hospital
30 bond Street
Toronto, On
M5B 1W8
Toronto ON  M5M 2P3
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Selzner-Malekkiani & M. Selzner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Selzner ( CPSO# 83694 )
Dr. N. Selzner-Malekkiani ( CPSO# 83701 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Surgery
11 PMB 178
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Gastroenterology Effective: 08 Sep 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Sep 2005 to 18 Nov 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 19 Nov 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 07 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 07 Sep 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.   Nazia   Selzner-Malekkiani   may   practise   medicine  independently  in
            gastroenterology.