Senderovich, Helena Mikhailovna (CPSO#: 81930)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Nov 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Russian

Education:Baskirian State Medical University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Baycrest Geriatric Health Care Sys
Dept of Family & Community Medicine
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone: 416-785-2500
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

15835 McLaughlin Rd.,
Bethell Hospice
Inglewood ON  L7C 1H4
Canada
Phone: (905) 838-3534
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

147 Elder Street
SageCare
Downsview ON  M3H 5G9
Canada
Phone: (416) 631-0405
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel
Russian Federation

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2004 to 03 Dec 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Dec 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Feb 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Oct 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Nov 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 24 Nov 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 24 Nov 2011 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Helena  Mikhailovna Senderovich may practise Family Medicine independently
            limited to Geriatrics and Palliative Care.